EP0102152 - Digital computer having analog signal circuitry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.1991 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.1991 [1991/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mehta Tech. Inc. Lancer Park, P.O. Box K Eldridge, Iowa 52748 / US | [1990/37] |
Former [1984/10] | For all designated states Automation Systems Inc. Lancer Park P.O. Box K. Eldridge, Iowa 52748 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartlett, Peter G. 2336 East 11th Street Davenport Iowa 52803 / US | [1984/10] | Representative(s) | Frost, Dennis Thomas, et al WITHERS & ROGERS 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | [1990/37] |
Former [1984/10] | Hartley, David Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 83303693.2 | 27.06.1983 | [1984/10] | Priority number, date | US19820392374 | 25.06.1982 Original published format: US 392374 | [1984/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0102152 | Date: | 07.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0102152 | Date: | 18.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0102152 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G06J1/00 | [1984/10] | CPC: |
G06J1/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1984/17] |
Former [1984/16] | |||
Former [1984/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Digitalrechner mit einer Schaltungsanordnung für analoge Signale | [1984/10] | English: | Digital computer having analog signal circuitry | [1984/10] | French: | Calculatrice numérique munie d'un montage pour signaux analogiques | [1984/10] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1990/38: Divisional application 88108295 filed on 25.05.88 | Examination procedure | 26.10.1983 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, LU, NL, SE | 05.01.1984 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/31] | 28.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP88108295.2 / EP0308583 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.07.1983 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 27.07.1983 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 27.07.1983 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 27.07.1983 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 27.07.1983 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4296464 [ ] (WOODS RODNEY G, et al); | US4275455 [ ] (BARTLETT PETER G) | Examination | - ELEKTRONIK, vol. 18, 1980, pages 57-62; München, DE H.G. ALTHOFF: "Multiprozessorbussystem für Europakarten" | - ELEKTROTECHNIK, vol. 63, no. 17, September 11, 1981, pages 30-33, Würzburg, DE W. SOEMER "Rationalisiert die Messwerterfassung " |