EP0099241 - Waste heat recovery system driven alternators and auxiliary drive systems therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.01.1987 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH SHIPBUILDERS (ENGINEERING AND TECHNICAL SERVICES) LIMITED P.O. Box 25 Pallion Sunderland Tyne and Wear SR4 6TG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/04] | For all designated states BRITISH SHIPBUILDERS (ENGINEERING AND TECHNICAL SERVICES) LIMITED P.O. Box 25 Pallion Sunderland Tyne and Wear SR4 6TG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lambley, Ian George 29 Fylingdale Drive Tunstall Sunderland SR3 2YB Tyne and Wear / GB | [1984/04] | Representative(s) | Mayes, Stuart David, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/04] | Mayes, Stuart David, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 83303946.4 | 06.07.1983 | [1984/04] | Priority number, date | GB19820019490 | 06.07.1982 Original published format: GB 8219490 | [1984/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0099241 | Date: | 25.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F01K23/14, F02G5/02, B63J3/02 | [1984/04] | CPC: |
B63J3/02 (EP,US);
F01K23/14 (EP,US);
F02G5/02 (EP,US);
Y02E20/14 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y02T70/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/04] | Title | German: | Von einem Wärmezurückgewinnungssystem angetriebene Wechselstromgeneratoren und Hilfsantriebssysteme dafür | [1984/04] | English: | Waste heat recovery system driven alternators and auxiliary drive systems therefor | [1984/04] | French: | Alternateurs entraînés par un système de récupération de chaleur et systèmes auxiliaires d'entraînement | [1984/04] | File destroyed: | 04.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 12.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/34] | 24.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1987/09] | 26.09.1986 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1987/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1986 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2296295 (SEMT [FR]); | [A]DE2758555 (MANNESMANN AG); | [A]EP0045843 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG [DE], et al) |