EP0100615 - Fungicidal anilides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1988 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.1988 [1988/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/07] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED Kitahama 4-chome 5-33 Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noguchi, Hiroshi 10-3-318, Sonehigashi-machi 2-chome Toyonaka Osaka / JP | 02 /
Kato, Toshiro 1-8, D-410, Sakasedai Takarazuka Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Junya 2-303, Ryodo-cho 4-chome Nishinomiya Hyogo / JP | 04 /
Ishiguri, Yukio 10-3-349, Sonehigashi-machi 2-chome Toyonaka Osaka / JP | 05 /
Yamamoto, Shigeo 2-16, Koda 2-chome Ikeda Osaka / JP | 06 /
Hirata, Naonori 704-2, 7-510, Kanaoka-cho Sakai Osaka / JP | [1984/07] | Representative(s) | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/07] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 83304028.0 | 11.07.1983 | [1984/07] | Priority number, date | GB19820021706 | 27.07.1982 Original published format: GB 8221706 | [1984/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0100615 | Date: | 15.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0100615 | Date: | 23.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07C103/737, C07C103/375, C07C103/38, C07C103/60, C07C103/78, C07C103/30, C07C103/46, C07C121/417, C07C121/80, A01N37/22, A01N37/34, // A01N37/24, A01N37/40, A01N53/00 | [1987/39] | CPC: |
A01N37/22 (EP,US);
A01N37/24 (EP,US);
A01N37/34 (EP,US);
A01N37/40 (EP,US);
A01N39/04 (EP,US);
A01N53/00 (EP,US);
C07C255/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1984/07] | C07C103/737, C07C103/375, C07C103/38, C07C103/60, C07C103/78, C07C103/30, C07C103/46, C07C121/417, C07C121/80, A01N37/22, A01N37/34 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1984/07] | Title | German: | Fungizide Anilide | [1984/07] | English: | Fungicidal anilides | [1984/07] | French: | Anilides fongicides | [1984/07] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/42] | 30.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP52083612 ; | [X]EP0007089 (CONSORTIUM ELEKTROCHEM IND [DE]); | [X]US3981814 (NIKAWITZ EDWARD J); | [X]US3975435 (NIKAWITZ EDWARD J); | [X]US3277107 (NEIGHBORS RALPH P); | [X]FR1372475 ; | [X]FR1492666 (UNILEVER NV); | [X]US4021224 (PALLOS FERENC M, et al); | [X]DE1803084 (CIBA GEIGY); | [X]FR2280630 (BASF AG [DE]); | [X]FR2099395 (CIBA GEIGY AG); | [A]CH299587 (VARIAPAT AG [CH]); | [A]FR5837M | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 28, no. 13, 10th July 1934, columns 4045/8-4046/2, Columbus, Ohio, USA | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 88, no. 13, 27th March 1978, page 490, no. 89336b, Columbus, Ohio, USA & JP-A-52 083 612 (TEIKOKU HORMONE MFG. CO., LTD.) 12-07-1977, & JP52083612 A 00000000 |