EP0099717 - Conducting unsaturated polyester resin compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.1987 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The British Petroleum Company p.l.c. Britannic House Moor Lane London EC2Y 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/05] | For all designated states The British Petroleum Company p.l.c. Britannic House Moor Lane London EC2Y 9BU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crisp, Russell Ian The British Petroleum Company p.l.c. Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | 02 /
Fogg, Sidney George The British Petroleum Company p.l.c. Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | [1984/05] | Representative(s) | MacLeod, Malcolm, et al BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | MacLeod, Malcolm, et al BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | ||
Former [1984/05] | Harry, John c/o The British Petroleum Company plc Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 83304037.1 | 12.07.1983 | [1984/05] | Priority number, date | GB19820020986 | 20.07.1982 Original published format: GB 8220986 | GB19830001799 | 22.01.1983 Original published format: GB 8301799 | [1984/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0099717 | Date: | 01.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0099717 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/06, C08F283/00, C08K3/04 | [1984/05] | CPC: |
H01B1/24 (EP);
C08K3/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L67/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/05] | Title | German: | Leitfähige Harzmassen aus ungesättigten Polyestern | [1984/05] | English: | Conducting unsaturated polyester resin compositions | [1984/05] | French: | Compositions conductibles à partir de résines de polyesters insaturés | [1984/05] | File destroyed: | 04.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 02.02.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/32] | 04.03.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1987/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1986 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2022848 ; | [A]DD111686 ; | [A]EP0038713 | [A] - KUNSTSTOFF-HANDBUCH, vol. VIII: "Polyester" 1973, CARL HANSER; M}nchenpage 412 |