EP0109140 - Recognition of continuous speech [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.1989 [1989/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPUTER BASIC TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH ASSOCIATION 4-28 Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/21] | For all designated states COMPUTER BASIC TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH ASSOCIATION 4-28 Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Atsuo 4-2-36 Kikyogaoka Nabari-shi Mie-ken / JP | 02 /
Ueda, Toru 492 Minosho-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi Nara-ken / JP | [1984/21] | Representative(s) | Wright, Peter David John, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [1984/21] | Application number, filing date | 83304074.4 | 13.07.1983 | [1984/21] | Priority number, date | JP19820184233 | 19.10.1982 Original published format: JP 18423382 | [1984/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0109140 | Date: | 23.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0109140 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G10L9/00 | [1988/44] | CPC: |
G10L25/87 (EP);
G10L15/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/21] | G10L1/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/21] | Title | German: | Erkennung kontinuierlicher Sprache | [1984/21] | English: | Recognition of continuous speech | [1984/21] | French: | Reconnaissance de la parole continue | [1984/21] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/36] | 17.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 24.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, vol. 46, no. 11, November 1963, pages246-256, Tokyo, JP., J. SUZUKI et al.: "Phonemic classification and recognition of Japanese monosyllables" | [X] - ICASSP 80 PROCEEDINGS-IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH & SIGNAL PROCESSING, Denver, 9th-11th April 1980, vol. 3, pages 876-879, IEEE, New York, USA, R. DE MORI et al.: "A parser for segmenting continuous speech into pseudo-syllabic nuclei" | [X] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, vol. ASSP-26, no. 5, October 1978, pages 409-418, New York, USA, D.H. JOHNSON et al.: "A phrase recognizer using syllable-based acoustic measurements" | [X] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRONIC COMPUTERS, vol. EC-12, no. 5, December 1963, pages 835-846, New York, USA, T. SAKAI et al.: "The automatic speech recognition system for conversational sound" | [X] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 4TH INTERNATIONAL JOINT CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, Kyoto, 7th-10th November 1978, pages 1009-1011, IEEE, New York, USA, R. NAKATSU et al.: "Speech recognition of connected words" |