EP0101205 - Process for preparing polyisobutylene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1987 [1987/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/08] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Frank Joung-yei 18 Thornton Lane Piscataway, NJ / US | 02 /
Brownawell, Darrell William 320 Roberts Lane Scotch Plains, NJ / US | [1987/02] |
Former [1984/08] | 01 /
Chen, Frank Joung-yei 18 Thornton Lane Piscataway New Jersey / US | ||
02 /
Brownawell, Darrell William 320 Roberts Lane Scotch Plains New Jersey / US | Representative(s) | Bawden, Peter Charles, et al Esso Chemical Research Centre PO Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/08] | Bawden, Peter Charles, et al Esso Chemical Research Centre PO Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 83304200.5 | 20.07.1983 | [1984/08] | Priority number, date | US19820407763 | 13.08.1982 Original published format: US 407763 | US19830508441 | 29.06.1983 Original published format: US 508441 | [1984/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0101205 | Date: | 22.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0101205 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0101205 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/14 | [1984/08] | CPC: |
C08F10/10 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/10, C08F4/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1984/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polyisobutylen | [1984/08] | English: | Process for preparing polyisobutylene | [1984/08] | French: | Procédé de préparation de polyisobutylène | [1984/08] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1983 | Examination requested [1984/08] | 28.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB933340 ; | [XD]US3985822 ; | [YD]US2957930 |