EP0104768 - Oral compositions comprising NG-acyl derivatives of arginine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.12.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Products Inc. 501 George Street New Brunswick New Jersey 08903 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/14] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Products Inc. 501 George Street New Brunswick New Jersey 08903 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Silbering, Steven Bernard 33-06 Fox Run Drive Plainsboro New Jersey 08536 / US | 02 /
Sipos, Tibor Bissell Road R.D. 2, Box 51 Lebanon New Jersey 08833 / US | [1984/14] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/14] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 83304922.4 | 25.08.1983 | [1984/14] | Priority number, date | US19820412048 | 26.08.1982 Original published format: US 412048 | [1984/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0104768 | Date: | 04.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0104768 | Date: | 22.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07C129/12, A61K31/195 | [1984/14] | CPC: |
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1984/14] | Title | German: | NG Acyl-argininderivate enthaltende orale Präparate | [1984/14] | English: | Oral compositions comprising NG-acyl derivatives of arginine | [1984/14] | French: | Compositions orales contenant des dérivés NG acylés de l'arginine | [1984/14] | File destroyed: | 05.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 13.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/10] | 11.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1988/03] | 28.08.1987 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1988/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB1352420 (AJINOMOTO KK); | [AD]US4225579 (KLEINBERG ISRAEL) | [X] - J. CHEM. SOC. CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, 1971, pages 1024-1025, London, GB; J.S. BLAND et al.: "Reductive cleavage of acyl-guanidines to amines". | [X] - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., vol. 83, 5th August 1961, pages 3300-3303, Washington D.C., USA; L. ZERVAS et al.: "Studies on arginine peptides. III. On the structure of tricarbobenzoxy-L-arginine". |