EP0102838 - Vibration damping supports [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.1987 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF BATH School of Chemistry Claverton Down Bath, BA2 7AY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/11] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF BATH School of Chemistry Claverton Down, Bath, BA2 7AY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Black, Joseph 20 Summerhill Road Bath, BA1 2UR Avon / GB | 02 /
Foster, Mark Andrew 57 Kitchener Road Amesbury Wiltshire / GB | 03 /
Luard, Nicholas Godfrey 9 Chalk Farm Close Willingdon Eastbourne Sussex, BN20 9HY / GB | [1984/11] | Representative(s) | Wynne-Jones, John Vaughan, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James, Essex Place, 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/11] | Wynne-Jones, John Vaughan, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22, Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 83305088.3 | 02.09.1983 | [1984/11] | Priority number, date | GB19820025269 | 04.09.1982 Original published format: GB 8225269 | GB19830000850 | 13.01.1983 Original published format: GB 8300850 | [1984/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0102838 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0102838 | Date: | 06.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61G3/00 | [1984/11] | CPC: |
F16F15/027 (EP,US);
A61G3/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/11] | Title | German: | Vibrationen dämpfende Träger | [1984/11] | English: | Vibration damping supports | [1984/11] | French: | Support amortissant | [1984/11] | File destroyed: | 05.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 18.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/36] | 07.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/36] | 31.03.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0021526 (UNIHEF AUTOMOBIEL BV [NL]); | [Y]FR2336343 (BINZ & CO [DE]); | [A]FR1567567 ; | [A]GB1401473 (INST IND RESEARCH STANDARDS, et al); | [A]FR2096321 (BURGT GERRIT V D, et al) |