EP0102850 - Layered photoresponsive device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.1988 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.1988 [1988/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/11] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horgan, Anthony M. 1 Pin Hook Lane Pittsford New York 14534 / US | [1984/11] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/11] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 83305203.8 | 07.09.1983 | [1984/11] | Priority number, date | US19820414997 | 07.09.1982 Original published format: US 414997 | [1984/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0102850 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0102850 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G03G5/00, G03G5/04, G03G5/10, C09B57/00 | [1984/11] | CPC: |
G03G5/14 (EP,US);
G03G5/0436 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/11] | Title | German: | Lichtreaktives Schichtmaterial | [1984/11] | English: | Layered photoresponsive device | [1984/11] | French: | Dispositif stratifié réactif à la lumière | [1984/11] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/38] | 24.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1581647 [ ] (XEROX CORP); | US4251612 [ ] (CHU JOSEPH Y C, et al); | US4047949 [ ] (HORGAN ANTHONY M); | GB1577237 [ ] (XEROX CORP); | GB1523137 [ ] (XEROX CORP); | DE2621854 [ ] (XEROX CORP); | US4353971 [ ] (CHANG MIKE S H, et al); | GB1577968 [ ] (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG) |