EP0108480 - Photoelectric conversion element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Tamio Corpo-Daini-Tanba 8-6-6, Kabe-machi Oome-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Kouhei 2-36-8, Tenno-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | [1984/20] | Representative(s) | Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al Marks & Clerk Incorporating Edward Evans Barker 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 83305333.3 | 13.09.1983 | [1984/20] | Priority number, date | JP19820190799 | 01.11.1982 Original published format: JP 19079982 | [1984/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0108480 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0108480 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108480 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
H01L27/14665 (EP,US);
H01L27/14603 (EP,US);
H01L27/14623 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/20] | H01L27/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/20] | Title | German: | Photoelektrisches Umsetzungselement | [1984/20] | English: | Photoelectric conversion element | [1984/20] | French: | Elément de conversion photoélectrique | [1984/20] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1983 | Examination requested [1984/20] | 15.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.12.1992 | CH | 02.12.1992 | FR | 02.12.1992 | IT | 02.12.1992 | LI | 02.12.1992 | NL | 02.12.1992 | SE | 02.12.1992 | [2004/35] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 02.12.1992 | |
CH | 02.12.1992 | ||
IT | 02.12.1992 | ||
LI | 02.12.1992 | ||
NL | 02.12.1992 | ||
SE | 02.12.1992 | ||
FR | 23.04.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 02.12.1992 | |
CH | 02.12.1992 | ||
LI | 02.12.1992 | ||
NL | 02.12.1992 | ||
SE | 02.12.1992 | ||
FR | 23.04.1993 | ||
Former [1993/48] | CH | 02.12.1992 | |
LI | 02.12.1992 | ||
NL | 02.12.1992 | ||
SE | 02.12.1992 | ||
FR | 23.04.1993 | ||
Former [1993/28] | CH | 02.12.1992 | |
LI | 02.12.1992 | ||
NL | 02.12.1992 | ||
SE | 02.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/27] | CH | 02.12.1992 | |
LI | 02.12.1992 | ||
NL | 02.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/23] | CH | 02.12.1992 | |
LI | 02.12.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JP58087862 ; | [A]JP57157563 ; | [A]US3577175 (GRI NORMAN I, et al); | [A]FR2088357 (BARNES ENG CO); | [A]DE2536350 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]FR2335053 (IBM [US]); | [Y]DE2723914 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]US4200892 (WEIMER PAUL K [US]); | [A]DE3031759 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]GB2074788 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) | [XP] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 182 (E-192) [1327], 11th August 1983; & JP - A - 58 087 862 (FUJI XEROX K.K.) 25-05-1983, & JP58087862 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 259 (E-149) [1137], 17th December 1982; & JP - A - 57 157 563 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 29-09-1982, & JP57157563 A 00000000 | Examination | JP5887862 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 182 (E-192) [1327], 11th August 1983; & JP - A - 58 87 862, & JP5887862 A 00000000 |