EP0134363 - Container for use as a pressure vessel in a hot water system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EVERLAST HOT WATER SYSTEMS (PROPRIETARY) LIMITED 27 Auckland Street Paarden Eiland Cape Town Cape Province / ZA | [N/P] |
Former [1985/12] | For all designated states EVERLAST HOT WATER SYSTEMS (PROPRIETARY) LIMITED 27 Auckland Street Paarden Eiland Cape Town Cape Province / ZA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kempski, Rolf Dieter 30 Llandudno Road Llandudno Cape Town Cape Province / ZA | [1985/12] | Representative(s) | Sheard, Andrew Gregory, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/12] | Sheard, Andrew Gregory, et al Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 83305364.8 | 13.09.1983 | [1985/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0134363 | Date: | 20.03.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0134363 | Date: | 13.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B29C5/04, B29D3/02, F24H1/18, F16J12/00 | [1985/46] | CPC: |
B29C41/20 (EP);
B29C41/22 (EP);
B29D22/003 (EP);
F16J12/00 (EP);
F24H1/181 (EP);
B29C2791/001 (EP);
B29C41/04 (EP);
B29K2023/00 (EP);
B29K2077/00 (EP);
B29K2105/06 (EP);
B29K2105/12 (EP);
B29K2105/24 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1985/44] | B29C5/04, B29D3/02, F24H1/18, F16J12/00 | ||
Former IPC [1985/12] | F16J12/00, B29D3/02, F24H1/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/12] | Title | German: | Behälter zur Verwendung als Druckgefäss in einem Heisswassersystem | [1985/12] | English: | Container for use as a pressure vessel in a hot water system | [1985/12] | French: | Récipient utilisé comme vase de pression dans un système à eau chaude | [1985/12] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 13.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/30] | 27.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/27] | 13.04.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.10.1986 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.10.1986 | 30.09.1987 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4191304 ; | [A]US4023257 ; | [A]DE2064598 ; | [A]GB2136098 ; | [A]DE1704381 ; | [A]US3966870 | [Y] - EUROPEAN PLASTICS NEWS, January 1975, page 42, London, GB; "Rotomoulding process for GRP developed in Japan" |