EP0107901 - Method and apparatus for identifying radar targets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.1990 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McGeoch, Ian Lachlan MacKay Southerns 37 Bayley Street Castle Hedingham Halstead Essex CO9 3DG / GB | For all designated states Stawell, William Bowring Taylers Farmhouse Aldsworth Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL7 2PF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/19] | For all designated states McGeoch, Ian Lachlan MacKay Southerns 37 Bayley Street Castle Hedingham Halstead Essex CO9 3DG / GB | ||
For all designated states Stawell, William Bowring Taylers Farmhouse Aldsworth Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL7 2PF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/19] | Representative(s) | Szczuka, Jan Tymoteusz, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/19] | Szczuka, Jan Tymoteusz, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 83305441.4 | 16.09.1983 | [1984/21] | Priority number, date | GB19820026640 | 18.09.1982 Original published format: GB 8226640 | [1984/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0107901 | Date: | 09.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0107901 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/78 | [1984/19] | CPC: |
G01S13/784 (EP,US);
G01S13/78 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Identifizierung von Radarzielen | [1989/16] | English: | Method and apparatus for identifying radar targets | [1984/19] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'identification de cibles radar | [1984/19] |
Former [1984/19] | Verfahren und Gerät zum Identifizierung von Radarzielen | Examination procedure | 17.01.1984 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Drawings | 21.02.1984 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Drawings {1} | 08.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/03] | 23.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.04.1989 | BE | 19.04.1989 | CH | 19.04.1989 | FR | 19.04.1989 | IT | 19.04.1989 | LI | 19.04.1989 | NL | 19.04.1989 | SE | 19.04.1989 | LU | 30.09.1989 | [2007/44] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 19.04.1989 | |
BE | 19.04.1989 | ||
CH | 19.04.1989 | ||
FR | 19.04.1989 | ||
IT | 19.04.1989 | ||
LI | 19.04.1989 | ||
NL | 19.04.1989 | ||
SE | 19.04.1989 | ||
LU | 30.09.1989 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 19.04.1989 | |
BE | 19.04.1989 | ||
CH | 19.04.1989 | ||
IT | 19.04.1989 | ||
LI | 19.04.1989 | ||
NL | 19.04.1989 | ||
SE | 19.04.1989 | ||
LU | 30.09.1989 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 19.04.1989 | |
BE | 19.04.1989 | ||
CH | 19.04.1989 | ||
IT | 19.04.1989 | ||
LI | 19.04.1989 | ||
NL | 19.04.1989 | ||
SE | 19.04.1989 | ||
Former [1991/08] | AT | 19.04.1989 | |
BE | 19.04.1989 | ||
CH | 19.04.1989 | ||
LI | 19.04.1989 | ||
NL | 19.04.1989 | ||
SE | 19.04.1989 | ||
Former [1990/10] | AT | 19.04.1989 | |
CH | 19.04.1989 | ||
LI | 19.04.1989 | ||
NL | 19.04.1989 | ||
SE | 19.04.1989 | ||
Former [1990/09] | AT | 19.04.1989 | |
CH | 19.04.1989 | ||
LI | 19.04.1989 | ||
SE | 19.04.1989 | ||
Former [1990/05] | CH | 19.04.1989 | |
LI | 19.04.1989 | ||
SE | 19.04.1989 | ||
Former [1989/36] | SE | 19.04.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2356952 (MAC GEOCH IAN [GB]); | [A]US4104629 (ISBISTER ERIC J, et al) |