EP0105668 - Procedure and apparatus for removing one or more layers of strands from multistrand cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1988 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.1988 [1988/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCAN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 1188 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal Quebec H3A 3G2 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states ALCAN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 1188 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal Quebec H3A 3G2 / CA | ||
Former [1984/16] | For all designated states ALCAN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED P.O Box 8400 Kingston, Ontario K7L 5L9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Branchaud, Maurice 3180, Boul. Neilson Ste-Foy Quebec / CA | [1984/16] | Representative(s) | Pennant, Pyers, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/16] | Pennant, Pyers, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 83305607.0 | 21.09.1983 | [1984/16] | Priority number, date | US19820425923 | 28.09.1982 Original published format: US 425923 | [1984/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0105668 | Date: | 18.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0105668 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0105668 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01B15/00 | [1984/16] | CPC: |
H01B15/005 (EP);
Y02W30/82 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1984/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Apparat zum Entfernen einer oder mehrerer Schichten von Seilen von Vielfachseilkabeln | [1984/16] | English: | Procedure and apparatus for removing one or more layers of strands from multistrand cable | [1984/16] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour enlever une ou plusieurs couches de brins de câble à multibrins | [1984/16] | Examination procedure | 07.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/13] | 26.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2351475 (RASCLE FRANCOIS [FR]); | [A]GB554257 (GEORGE JENNINGS CODRINGTON BAL); | [A]US2366271 (LERCH BROOKE W) |