EP0109742 - Numerical control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/22] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kishi, Hajimu Hinohiroyamadai-Jutaku 1104 6-7-8 Asahigaoka Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kurakake, Mitsuo Izumi-Haitsu 103 3-3-10, Tamadaira Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Seki, Masaki 3-15-2-406, Takaidonishi Suginami-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Tanaka, Kunio 5-8-13, Tamagawa-cho Akishima-shi Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Matsumura, Teruyuki 38-8, Matsugaya Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | [1984/22] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/22] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 83305900.9 | 29.09.1983 | [1984/22] | Priority number, date | JP19820170673 | 29.09.1982 Original published format: JP 17067382 | [1984/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0109742 | Date: | 30.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0109742 | Date: | 18.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/405 | [1984/22] | CPC: |
G05B19/409 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36161 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/22] | Title | German: | Numerisch gesteuerte Anlage | [1984/22] | English: | Numerical control system | [1984/22] | French: | Système à commande numérique | [1984/22] | File destroyed: | 11.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 29.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/52] | 29.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/03] | 20.08.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.10.1990 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0034017 (FANUC LTD [JP]); | [A]US4281379 (AUSTIN LEN S); | [A]GB2054909 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES) |