EP0108502 - A plastics moulded semiconductor device and a method of producing it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1990 [1990/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubota, Akihiro Fujitsu-Ida-shataku B-308 100, Idasanmai-cho Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | 02 /
Sugiura, Rikio 1882-21, Shinto Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 228 / JP | 03 /
Aoki, Tsuyoshi Fujitsu-Ida-Shataku 4207 100 Idasanmai-cho Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | 04 /
Ono, Michio 20-19, Kouenjiminami 1-chome Suginami-ku Tokyo 166 / JP | [1989/03] |
Former [1984/20] | 01 /
Kubota, Akihiro Fujitsu-Ida-shataku B-308 100, Idasanmai-cho Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | ||
02 /
Sugiura, Rikio 1882-21, Shinto Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 288 / JP | |||
03 /
Aoki, Tsuyoshi Fujitsu-Ida-Shataku 4207 100 Idasanmai-cho Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | |||
04 /
Ono, Michio 20-19, Kouenjiminami 1-chome Suginami-ku Tokyo 166 / JP | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 83306055.1 | 06.10.1983 | [1984/20] | Priority number, date | JP19820177353 | 08.10.1982 Original published format: JP 17735382 | [1984/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0108502 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0108502 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108502 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/30, H01L23/48, H01L23/28, // H01L23/56, H01L21/56 | [1984/20] | CPC: |
H01L23/49537 (EP,US);
H01L23/48 (KR);
H01L21/565 (EP,US);
H01L23/3107 (EP,US);
H01L23/3135 (EP,US);
H01L23/3157 (EP,US);
H01L23/495 (EP,US);
H01L23/49503 (EP,US);
H01L23/49589 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4826 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49171 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49175 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/49 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45014, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49171, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49175, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/20] | Title | German: | Plastikverkapselte Halbleiteranordnung und ein Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1984/20] | English: | A plastics moulded semiconductor device and a method of producing it | [1984/20] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur encapsulé en plastique et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1984/20] | Examination procedure | 04.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/15] | 27.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2117369 (MOTOROLA INC); | [X]US3922712 (STRYKER HARRY L); | [A]US3838984 (CRANE J, et al); | [A]US4308339 (LINDBERG FRANK A); | [A]GB2091035 (AVX CORP); | [A]US4215360 (EYTCHESON CHARLES T [US]) |