EP0107940 - Fuel control system for a gas turbine engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.06.1988 [1988/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Great King Street Birmingham, B19 2XF West Midlands / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/19] | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Great King Street Birmingham, B19 2XF West Midlands / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Trevor Stanley 3 Streather Road Four Oaks Sutton Coldfield / GB | [1984/19] | Representative(s) | Cuddon, George Desmond, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [1984/19] | Application number, filing date | 83306075.9 | 07.10.1983 | [1984/19] | Priority number, date | GB19820030796 | 28.10.1982 Original published format: GB 8230796 | [1984/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0107940 | Date: | 09.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0107940 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F02C9/28, F02C9/32 | [1984/19] | CPC: |
F02C9/263 (EP,US);
F02C9/28 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7737 (EP,US);
Y10T137/777 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/19] | Title | German: | Kraftstoffregelung für einen Gasturbinenmotor | [1984/19] | English: | Fuel control system for a gas turbine engine | [1984/19] | French: | Régulation de carburant pour un moteur à turbine à gaz | [1984/19] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1984 | Examination requested [1985/01] | 24.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP85113983.2 / EP0180248 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2054744 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD); | [Y]GB871474 (UNITED AIRCRAFT CORP); | [AD]GB2088962 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD) |