EP0107502 - Matrix dot printer with printed dot density control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.1986 [1986/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanders, Royden C. Jr. Burton Highway Wilton New Hampshire 03086 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/18] | For all designated states Sanders, Royden C. Jr. Burton Highway Wilton New Hampshire 03086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/18] | Representative(s) | Sommerville, John Henry, et al Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/18] | Sommerville, John Henry, et al SOMMERVILLE & RUSHTON 11 Holywell Hill St. Albans Hertfordshire, AL1 1EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 83306464.5 | 25.10.1983 | [1984/18] | Priority number, date | US19820436951 | 27.10.1982 Original published format: US 436951 | [1984/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0107502 | Date: | 02.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0107502 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/02 | [1984/18] | CPC: |
B41J25/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1984/18] | Title | German: | Punktmatrixdrucker mit einer Dichtesteuervorrichtung für die Druckpunkte | [1984/18] | English: | Matrix dot printer with printed dot density control | [1984/18] | French: | Imprimante à matrice de points avec dispositif de commande de la densité d'impression des points | [1984/18] | File destroyed: | 09.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 01.05.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/44] | 27.05.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1986/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.02.1986 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0031421 ; | [A]EP0027734 |