EP0108546 - Oil based drilling fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 30.08.1989 [1989/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALLIBURTON COMPANY P.O. Drawer 1431 Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | For all designated states HALLIBURTON COMPANY P.O. Drawer 1431 Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harmon, Bobby Ray 278 N. Deeside Road Cults Aberdeen Scotland, AB1 9PB / GB | [1984/20] | Representative(s) | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 83306469.4 | 25.10.1983 | [1984/20] | Priority number, date | GB19820031375 | 03.11.1982 Original published format: GB 8231375 | [1984/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0108546 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0108546 | Date: | 18.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108546 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C09K7/06, C09K7/00 | [1985/46] | CPC: |
C09K8/36 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/20] | C09K7/06 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1984/20] | Title | German: | Bohrflüssigkeiten auf Ölbasis | [1988/11] | English: | Oil based drilling fluids | [1984/20] | French: | Fluides de forage à base d'huile | [1984/20] |
Former [1984/20] | Auf Öl basierte Bohrflüssigkeiten | Examination procedure | 22.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/13] | 18.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.08.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 31.03.1988 | BE | 31.10.1988 | [1989/35] |
Former [1989/21] | SE | 31.03.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2588808 (DAWSON REGINALD D); | [X]US2675352 (DAWSON REGINALD D); | [X]US2689219 (MENAUL PAUL L); | [X]US3775447 (ANDREWS R, et al) |