EP0108578 - Address transformation system having an address shuffler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.1990 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.1990 [1990/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMPEX CORPORATION 401 Broadway M.S. 3-35 Redwood City California 94063-3199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | For all designated states AMPEX CORPORATION 401 Broadway M.S. 3-35 Redwood City California 94063-3199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chow, Y. T. Flat 1207 Block 2 Ngau Tau Kok Upper Estate Kowloon / HK | [1984/20] | Representative(s) | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al Bowles Horton Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted, Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 83306596.4 | 28.10.1983 | [1984/20] | Priority number, date | US19820438290 | 01.11.1982 Original published format: US 438290 | [1984/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0108578 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0108578 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108578 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/20 | [1984/20] | CPC: |
G11C29/76 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/20] | Title | German: | Adressenumwandlungssystem mit einem Adressenmischer | [1984/20] | English: | Address transformation system having an address shuffler | [1984/20] | French: | Système de transformation d'adresse ayant un mélangeur d'adresse | [1984/20] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/47] | 20.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4089063 (TAKEZONO TAKASHI, et al); | [A]US3812336 (HSIAO M, et al); | [A]US3992702 (BAILEY NIGEL RONALD HASSALL) | [X] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTERS, vol. C-24, no. 12, December 1975, pages 1145-1155, New York, US; D.H. LAWRIE: "Access and alignment of data in an array processor" |