EP0109236 - Friction spinning-roller roughness [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.05.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.1988 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 06.07.1988 [1988/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLLINGSWORTH (U.K.) LIMITED Scaitcliffe Street P.O. Box 55 Accrington Lancashire BB5 0RN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/21] | For all designated states HOLLINGSWORTH (U.K.) LIMITED Scaitcliffe Street P.O. Box 55 Accrington Lancashire BB5 0RN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parker, Alan 7 Darvel Close Breightmet Bolton Greater Manchester / GB | 02 /
Farnhill, William M. 335 Colne Road Burnley / GB | [1984/21] | Representative(s) | Barlow, Roy James, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/21] | Barlow, Roy James, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 83306713.5 | 03.11.1983 | [1984/21] | Priority number, date | GB19820031908 | 09.11.1982 Original published format: GB 8231908 | [1984/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0109236 | Date: | 23.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0109236 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/30] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0109236 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | D01H1/135 | [1984/21] | CPC: |
D01H4/18 (EP,US);
D01H4/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1984/21] | Title | German: | Walzen mit Rauheiten für Friktionsspinnmaschine | [1984/21] | English: | Friction spinning-roller roughness | [1984/21] | French: | Cylindres avec aspérités pour machine à filer à friction | [1984/21] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/24] | 01.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.04.1987
08.05.1987
ADMISSIBLE W. Schlafhorst & Co. Blumenberger Strasse 143 - 145 D-41061 Mönchengladbach / DE | 02
22.04.1987
09.06.1987
ADMISSIBLE Wilhelm Stahlecker GmbH D-73326 Deggingen / DE Opponent's representative Wilhelm, Hans-Herbert, et al, et al Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.04.1987
08.05.1987
ADMISSIBLE W. Schlafhorst & Co. Blumenberger Strasse 143 - 145 D-41061 Mönchengladbach / DE | ||
02
22.04.1987
09.06.1987
ADMISSIBLE Wilhelm Stahlecker GmbH D-73326 Deggingen / DE Opponent's representative Wilhelm, Hans-Herbert, Dr.-Ing., et al, et al Wilhelm & Dauster Patentanwälte Hospitalstrasse 8 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [1987/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.04.1987
08.05.1987
ADMISSIBLE W. Schlafhorst & Co. Blumenberger Strasse 143 - 145 D-41061 Mönchengladbach / DE | 10.06.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.11.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.01.1988 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 21.03.1988 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.07.1986 | [1987/22] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB2068025 (FEHRER ERNST); | [A]GB2075071 (REINERS VERWALTUNGS GMBH) |