EP0110593 - Ultrasonic scanning apparatus and techniques [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.1989 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 07.06.1989 [1989/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ULTRAMED, INC. 2, Carter Brook Road, RD 4 Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | For all designated states ULTRAMED, INC. 2, Carter Brook Road, RD 4 Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gardineer, Bayard 6 Pine Brae Skillman New Jersey 08558 / US | 02 /
Vilkomerson, David 2 Carter Brook Lane RD 4 Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | [1984/24] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis, et al Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | Wombwell, Francis, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 83306759.8 | 07.11.1983 | [1984/24] | Priority number, date | US19820443488 | 22.11.1982 Original published format: US 443488 | [1984/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0110593 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0110593 | Date: | 22.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0110593 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/00 | [1984/24] | CPC: |
G10K11/357 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Ultraschallabtastung | [1984/24] | English: | Ultrasonic scanning apparatus and techniques | [1984/24] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de balayage ultrasonique | [1984/24] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/12] | 28.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 01.06.1988 | SE | 30.06.1988 | [1989/23] |
Former [1989/11] | NL | 01.06.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1410212 (SECR DEFENCE); | [A]EP0037047 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]); | [A]US4324140 (AULD BERTRAM A); | [X]EP0062390 (OPTISCHE IND DE OUDE DELFT NV [NL]) |