EP0108649 - A process for producing a protein adhesive binder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RALSTON PURINA COMPANY Checkerboard Square St. Louis Missouri 63164 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | For all designated states RALSTON PURINA COMPANY Checkerboard Square St. Louis Missouri 63164 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coco, Charles E. 333 N. Boyle St. Louis Missouri 63108 / US | 02 /
Graham, Paul M. 218 Lark Hill Lane Ballwin Missouri 63011 / US | 03 /
Krinski, Thomas L. 3308 Franklin Granite City Illinois 62040 / US | [1984/20] | Representative(s) | Tubby, David George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | Tubby, David George, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 83306806.7 | 08.11.1983 | [1984/20] | Priority number, date | US19820440111 | 08.11.1982 Original published format: US 440111 | [1984/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0108649 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108649 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | D21H17/22, C08H1/00 | [1991/38] | CPC: |
C08H1/00 (EP,US);
D21H19/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/20] | D21H1/24, C08H1/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1984/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Adhäsionsbindemittels aus Protein | [1984/20] | English: | A process for producing a protein adhesive binder | [1984/20] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'un liant adhésif protéinique | [1984/20] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/36] | 20.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 23.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1990 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.08.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 02.08.1990 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 20.08.1990 | Appeal received No. T0293/86 | 20.08.1990 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.11.1990 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 11.06.1986 | Appeal received No. T0293/86 | 11.08.1986 | Statement of grounds filed | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US2862918 (MEYER EDWIN W, et al); | [Y]DE2416770 (JAECKERING MUEHLEN UND NAEHRMI) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, volume 70, no. 5, February 3, 1969, page 1888, abstract 19014z (COLUMBUS, OHIO, US) AOKI HIROSHI et al. "Gelation of soybean proteins. IV. Effects of reducting agents, oxidizing agents, and protein denaturants", & Nippon Nogei Kakgaku Kaishi 1968, 42(9), 544-52 | by applicant | US2862918 | US2932589 |