EP0110601 - Trigger circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.1988 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1988 [1988/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Tektronix Industrial Park D/S Y3-121 4900 S.W. Griffith Drive P.O. Box 500 Beaverton Oregon 97077 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Tektronix Industrial Park D/S Y3-121 4900 S.W. Griffith Drive P.O. Box 500 Beaverton Oregon 97077 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlotzhauer, Kenneth George Route 1 Box 485 Beaverton Oregon 97007 / US | 02 /
Metz, Arthur James 12740 Frolow Drive N.E. Gervais Oregon 97026 / US | [1984/24] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis, et al Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | Wombwell, Francis, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 83306861.2 | 10.11.1983 | [1984/24] | Priority number, date | US19820444764 | 26.11.1982 Original published format: US 444764 | [1984/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0110601 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0110601 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01R13/32 | [1984/24] | CPC: |
G01R13/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1984/24] | Title | German: | Triggerschaltung | [1984/24] | English: | Trigger circuit | [1984/24] | French: | Montage de déclenchement | [1984/24] | Examination procedure | 03.09.1984 | Examination requested [1984/51] | 20.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3358159 (SMITH GEORGE E); | [Y]DE2028374 (TEKTRONIX INC); | [Y]US4096397 (DREILING JAMES A) |