EP0110665 - Comminuting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1988 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.1988 [1988/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PEAK PATTERN CO. LIMITED Palmtree Works 31 Staniford Road Sheffield, S9 3HB / GB | [1984/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bloor Stuart Geoffrey Gibbins "Ranworth" Oldmill Lane Thurgoland Sheffield, S30 4AG / GB | [1984/24] | Representative(s) | Stanley, David William, et al APPLEYARD LEES & CO. 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/27] | Stanley, David William, et al APPLEYARD LEES & CO. 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [1984/24] | Houghton, David Hulse & Co. Eagle Star House, Carver Street Sheffield S1 4FP / GB | Application number, filing date | 83307148.3 | 23.11.1983 | [1984/24] | Priority number, date | GB19820033900 | 27.11.1982 Original published format: GB 8233900 | GB19830014967 | 31.05.1983 Original published format: GB 8314967 | [1984/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0110665 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0110665 | Date: | 11.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0110665 | Date: | 10.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B02C4/30, B02C4/08, B02C18/28 | [1984/24] | CPC: |
B02C18/28 (EP);
B02C4/08 (EP);
B02C4/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1984/24] | Title | German: | Zerkleinerungsmaschine | [1984/24] | English: | Comminuting apparatus | [1984/24] | French: | Appareil broyeur | [1984/24] | Examination procedure | 05.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/43] | 06.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.02.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR319015 ; | [Y]DE2936351 ; | [Y]DE1221081 ; | [Y]GB1558423 ; | [Y]US4219291 ; | [Y]GB469343 ; | [Y]US4042183 ; | [YP]WO8303062 ; | [AP]GB2110954 |