EP0112656 - Peptide compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1990 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.02.1991 [1991/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NYCOMED A/S Nycoveien 2 N-0485 Oslo 4 / NO | [1990/04] |
Former [1984/27] | For all designated states NYEGAARD & CO. A/S Nycoveien 2 Postboks 4220 Oslo 4 / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laerum, Ole Didrik Jaegerbakken 14A 5035 Bergen Sandviken / NO | [1984/27] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/27] | Holmes, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London, WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 83307210.1 | 25.11.1983 | [1984/27] | Priority number, date | GB19820033837 | 26.11.1982 Original published format: GB 8233837 | [1984/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0112656 | Date: | 04.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0112656 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0112656 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61K37/02, C07K7/06, C07C103/52 | [1985/34] | CPC: |
C07K7/067 (EP,US);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/28] | A61K37/02, A61K37/02, C07C103/52 | ||
Former IPC [1984/27] | C07C103/52, A61K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/27] | Title | German: | Peptidverbindungen | [1984/27] | English: | Peptide compounds | [1984/27] | French: | Composés peptidiques | [1984/27] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/12] | 16.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 98, no. 9, 28th February 1983, page 230, no. 67383u, Columbus, Ohio, US; W.R. PAUKOVITS et al.: "Isolation and synthesis of a hemoregulatory peptide" & Z. NATURFORSCH., C: BIOSCI. 1982, 37C(11-12), 1297-300 | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 99, no. 1, 4th July 1983, page 113, no. 1022q, Columbus, Ohio, US; P. FOA et al.: "A synthetic pentapeptide inhibiting normal and leukemic myelopoiesis in vitro" & IRCS MED. SCI.: LIBR. COMPEND. 1983, 11(3), 272-3 |