EP0113205 - Method of, and apparatus for, filtering a slurry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.1990 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEETLEY REFRACTORIES LIMITED P.O. Box 6 Gateford Hill Worksop Nottinghamshire S81 8AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/28] | For all designated states STEETLEY REFRACTORIES LIMITED P.O. Box 6 Gateford Hill Worksop Nottinghamshire S81 8AF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pearce, Kenneth Walter "HIGHNAM" Park Avenue Hartlepool County Cleveland / GB | [1984/28] | Representative(s) | Hardisty, David Robert, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/28] | Hardisty, David Robert, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A IPQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 83307425.5 | 06.12.1983 | [1984/28] | Priority number, date | GB19820036501 | 22.12.1982 Original published format: GB 8236501 | [1984/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0113205 | Date: | 11.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0113205 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B01D25/12, B01D35/20 | [1984/28] | CPC: |
B01D35/20 (EP,US);
B01D25/19 (EP,US);
B01D25/285 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zur Filtrierung eines Schlammes | [1984/28] | English: | Method of, and apparatus for, filtering a slurry | [1984/28] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la filtration d'une boue | [1984/28] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 24.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 29.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 19.06.1985 | Appeal received No. T0047/87 | 08.01.1987 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.07.1988 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1988/28] | 16.08.1988 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1988/34] | 11.11.1988 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.07.1989 | SE | 07.12.1989 | BE | 31.12.1989 | CH | 31.12.1989 | LI | 31.12.1989 | [1991/29] |
Former [1991/17] | SE | 07.12.1989 | |
BE | 31.12.1989 | ||
CH | 31.12.1989 | ||
LI | 31.12.1989 | ||
Former [1991/08] | SE | 07.12.1989 | |
CH | 31.12.1989 | ||
LI | 31.12.1989 | ||
Former [1990/39] | SE | 07.12.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2724508 (LUTHER MARTIN W); | [X]FR1363465 (CIBA GEIGY); | [A]EP0027910 (KUEBLER HANS) | by applicant | FR1363465 |