EP0113228 - Improvements relating to security cards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.1986 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McCORQUODALE PLC McCorquodale House 15, Cavendish Square London W1M OHT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/28] | For all designated states McCORQUODALE PLC McCorquodale House 15, Cavendish Square London W1M OHT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boyd, Paul 29 Old Berg Gardens Hatch Warren Lane Basingstoke Hampshire / GB | 02 /
Squires, Alan Henry 5 Holmbury Keep Langshott Lane Horley Surrey / GB | 03 /
Christian, David Patrick Kingston 25 Park Lane Maplehurst Sussex RH3 6LL / GB | [1984/28] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/28] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 83307742.3 | 20.12.1983 | [1984/28] | Priority number, date | GB19820036826 | 24.12.1982 Original published format: GB 8236826 | GB19830001539 | 20.01.1983 Original published format: GB 8301539 | GB19830003100 | 04.02.1983 Original published format: GB 8303100 | [1984/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0113228 | Date: | 11.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0113228 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/02 | [1984/28] | CPC: |
B42D25/47 (EP,US);
B42D25/00 (EP);
B42D25/318 (EP,US);
B42D25/42 (EP,US);
B42D2033/06 (EP);
B42D2033/14 (EP);
B42D2033/28 (EP);
B42D2035/02 (EP);
B42D2035/06 (EP);
B42D2035/08 (EP);
B42D2035/34 (EP);
B42D2035/44 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1984/28] | Title | German: | Sicherheitskarten | [1984/28] | English: | Improvements relating to security cards | [1984/28] | French: | Cartes de sécurité | [1984/28] | File destroyed: | 10.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 28.04.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/45] | 02.06.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.02.1986 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3755935 ; | [X]US4171864 ; | [X]US2395804 ; | [Y]FR1564311 ; | [Y]DE3027658 ; | [A]US3571957 ; | [A]US3204354 ; | [A]US3758970 |