EP0113246 - Radio communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1990 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.1990 [1990/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/28] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Susumu 1-8-17, Fujigaya Kugenuma Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251 / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Hiroshi 13-4, Sagamidai 3-chome Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 228 / JP | 03 /
Fukuda, Eisuke Nakayama Bldg. 202 2-10-2, Nagatsuda Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227 / JP | [1984/28] | Representative(s) | Fane, Christopher Robin King, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/28] | Fane, Christopher Robin King, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 83307949.4 | 23.12.1983 | [1984/28] | Priority number, date | JP19820231634 | 29.12.1982 Original published format: JP 23163482 | JP19820231635 | 29.12.1982 Original published format: JP 23163582 | JP19820231636 | 29.12.1982 Original published format: JP 23163682 | [1984/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0113246 | Date: | 11.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0113246 | Date: | 13.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0113246 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/02 | [1984/28] | CPC: |
H04L27/3836 (EP,US);
H04L27/18 (KR);
H04L27/3455 (EP,US);
H04L27/362 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/28] | Title | German: | Radio-Kommunikationssystem | [1984/28] | English: | Radio communication system | [1984/28] | French: | Système de communication radio | [1984/28] | Examination procedure | 03.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/49] | 20.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE766847 (ACEC); | [A]US3813598 (STUART R); | [A]US3849730 (HO E); | [A]US4074199 (DE JAGER FRANK, et al) | [XP] - IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, San Diego, California, US, 28th November - 1st December 1983, vol. 2, pages 25.5.1-25.5.5, IEEE, New York, US; E. FUKUDA et al.: "Design of 64 QAM modem for high-capacity digital radio systems" |