EP0087336 - Transistor mixer for microwave frequency transmitters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.08.1990 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.1990 | Revocation of patent | published on 10.10.1990 [1990/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1983/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bensussan, André THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Birot, Patrice THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 03 /
Curtinot, Jean-Claude THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 04 /
Van Kerrebroeck, Claude THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1983/35] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/14] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | ||
Former [1983/35] | Lincot, Georges THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 83400222.2 | 02.02.1983 | [1983/35] | Priority number, date | FR19820002346 | 12.02.1982 Original published format: FR 8202346 | [1983/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0087336 | Date: | 31.08.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0087336 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H03D7/12 | [1983/35] | CPC: |
H03D7/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/35] | Title | German: | Transistormischer für Hyperfrequenz-Sender | [1983/35] | English: | Transistor mixer for microwave frequency transmitters | [1983/35] | French: | Mélangeur à transistor pour émetteurs hyperfréquences | [1983/35] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/13] | 13.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.04.1987
12.05.1987
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.04.1987
12.05.1987
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 09.06.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.10.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.10.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 08.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 17.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 17.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 27.05.1990 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1990/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2147559 (BLAUPUNKT WERKE GMBH); | [A]FR1145253 (PHILIPS NV); | [A]US3040255 (MUKAI VICTOR S) | [Y] - GTH EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE, ROME 14-17 septembre 1976, pages 8-13, Seven Oaks, GB. | [Y] - IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM, Cherry Hill, 14-16 juin 1976, pages 90-92, Piscataway, USA | [A] - RADIOMENTOR ELECTRONIC, vol. 42, no. 6, juin 1976, pages 220-222, Munich, DE. | [A] - FUNKSCHAU, vol. 38, no. 22, 2 novembre 1966, pages 685-687, Munich, DE. |