EP0087369 - Improved electronic keyboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 29.07.1989 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.1989 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 13.09.1989 [1989/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 146 Main Street Maynard, MA 01754 / US | [1983/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leitermann, Richard 7, Cypress Road 702 Brighton Massachusetts 02135 / US | 02 /
Wilson, Bruce G. 557 Dutton Road Sudbury Massachusetts 01776 / US | [1983/35] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o SOCIETE DE PROTECTION DES INVENTIONS 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1983/35] | Application number, filing date | 83400355.0 | 21.02.1983 | [1983/35] | Priority number, date | US19820351719 | 24.02.1982 Original published format: US 351719 | [1983/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0087369 | Date: | 31.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0087369 | Date: | 30.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/18] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0087369 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/70 | [1983/35] | CPC: |
H01H13/807 (EP,US);
H01H13/70 (EP,US);
H01H13/705 (EP,US);
H01H13/785 (EP,US);
H01H2001/0005 (EP,US);
H01H2201/03 (EP,US);
H01H2207/042 (EP,US);
H01H2213/01 (EP,US);
H01H2217/016 (EP,US);
H01H2217/03 (EP,US);
H01H2223/032 (EP,US);
H01H2225/01 (EP,US);
H01H2229/034 (EP,US);
H01H2229/038 (EP,US);
H01H2233/004 (EP,US);
H01H2233/012 (EP,US);
H01H2233/024 (EP,US);
H01H2233/056 (EP,US);
H01H2235/024 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/35] | Title | German: | Elektronisches Tastenfeld | [1983/35] | English: | Improved electronic keyboard | [1983/35] | French: | Clavier électronique amélioré | [1983/35] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/13] | 25.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.01.1987
13.02.1987
ADMISSIBLE TELEFUNKEN electronic GmbH Postfach 35 35 D-74025 Heilbronn / DE Opponent's representative Maute, Hans-Jürgen DaimlerChrysler AG, Theresienstrasse 2 74072 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.01.1987
13.02.1987
ADMISSIBLE TELEFUNKEN electronic GmbH Postfach 35 35 D-74025 Heilbronn / DE Opponent's representative Maute, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH, Postfach 35 35 D-74025 Heilbronn / DE | 17.03.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.07.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.07.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 11.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 10.04.1989 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 20.06.1989 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.03.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3909564 (SCHEINGOLD WILLIAM SAMUEL, et al); | [Y]DE2443429 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]GB2088131 (KEYBOARD THE CO); | [AP]DE3044847 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULELTIN, vol. 20, no. 7, December 1977, pages 2784-2785, New York, USA |