EP0090694 - Frequency-tunable oscillator comprising an oscillating diode and a variable-capacity diode, and a mechanical tuning method for such an oscillator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.1986 [1986/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1983/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heitzmann, Michel THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Lelong, Christian THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1983/40] | Representative(s) | Taboureau, James, et al THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud 92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/40] | Taboureau, James, et al THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 83400505.0 | 11.03.1983 | [1983/40] | Priority number, date | FR19820004914 | 23.03.1982 Original published format: FR 8204914 | [1983/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0090694 | Date: | 05.10.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0090694 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H03B9/14 | [1983/40] | CPC: |
H03B9/141 (EP);
H03B2009/126 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1983/40] | Title | German: | Oszillierende Diode und variable Kapazitätsdiode enthaltender, in Frequenz abstimmbarer Oszillator, und Verfahren zur mechanischen Abstimmung eines solchen Oszillators | [1983/40] | English: | Frequency-tunable oscillator comprising an oscillating diode and a variable-capacity diode, and a mechanical tuning method for such an oscillator | [1983/40] | French: | Oscillateur accordable en fréquence constitué par une diode oscillatrice et une diode à capacité variable, et procédé d'accord mécanique de cet oscillateur | [1983/40] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1983 | Examination requested [1983/51] | 12.06.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.08.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3792374 ; | [A]EP0005096 ; | [A]FR2183016 ; | [A]FR2392539 | [A] - 11th EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE, Amsterdam, 7-11 septembre 1981, pages 888-893, Sevenoaks, GB. | Examination | EP0068946 | - 11th EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE, Amsterdam, 7-11 septembre 1981, pages 888-893, Sevenoaks, GB. J. ONDRIA: "Partially integrated electronically tuned millimeter-wave (33-75 GHz) gunn oscillators" |