EP0092470 - Damping device for a drum brake, brake support plate incorporating the same and a drum brake with support plate provided with such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BENDIX France 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | [1985/40] |
Former [1983/43] | For all designated states SOCIETE ANONYME D.B.A. Centre Paris Pleyel F-93521 St-Denis Cédex 01 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amblard, Patrick 21 Rue d'Aguesseau F-92100 Boulogne / FR | [1983/43] | Representative(s) | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 83400734.6 | 13.04.1983 | [1983/43] | Priority number, date | FR19820006859 | 21.04.1982 Original published format: FR 8206859 | [1983/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0092470 | Date: | 26.10.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0092470 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/00, F16F7/10 | [1983/43] | CPC: |
F16F7/104 (EP);
F16D51/00 (EP);
F16D65/00 (EP);
F16D65/0018 (EP);
F16D2051/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, SE [1983/43] | Title | German: | Dämpfungsvorrichtung für Trommelbremse, Bremsankerplatte mit solcher Vorrichtung und Trommelbremse mit Bremsankerplatte versehen mit einer solchen Vorrichtung | [1983/43] | English: | Damping device for a drum brake, brake support plate incorporating the same and a drum brake with support plate provided with such a device | [1983/43] | French: | Dispositif amortisseur pour frein à tambour, plaque support de frein incorporant un tel dispositif et frein à tambour comportant une plaque support équipée d'un tel dispositif | [1983/43] | Examination procedure | 20.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/43] | 01.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.04.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.04.1986 | [1991/51] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2006293 ; | [Y]GB577356 ; | [A]FR2351804 |