EP0094279 - Method of protecting a telemonitoring system against sabotage and system carrying out this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/46] | Protection method of a telemonitoring system against sabotage and system carrying out this method | ||
[1986/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.02.1987 [1987/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE EUROPEENNE DE TELETRANSMISSION C.E.T.T. 51, boulevard de la Republique F-78400 Chatou / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/46] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE EUROPEENNE DE TELETRANSMISSION C.E.T.T. 51, boulevard de la Republique F-78400 Chatou / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tonello, Marc THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1983/46] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/17] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | ||
Former [1983/46] | Turlèque, Clotilde THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 83400810.4 | 22.04.1983 | [1983/46] | Priority number, date | FR19820007523 | 30.04.1982 Original published format: FR 8207523 | [1983/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0094279 | Date: | 16.11.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0094279 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G08B29/00, G08B26/00 | [1983/46] | CPC: |
G08B29/08 (EP,US);
G08B26/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1983/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Schutz eines Fernüberwachungssystemes gegen Sabotage und System zur Ausführung dieses Verfahrens | [1986/08] | English: | Method of protecting a telemonitoring system against sabotage and system carrying out this method | [1986/08] | French: | Procédé de protection d'un système de télésurveillance contre un sabotage, et système mettant en oeuvre ce procédé | [1983/46] |
Former [1983/46] | Schutzverfahren eines Fernüberwachungssystemes gegen Sabotage und System zur Ausführung dieses Verfahrens | ||
Former [1983/46] | Protection method of a telemonitoring system against sabotage and system carrying out this method | Examination procedure | 29.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/23] | 12.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3171108 (CRERAR MACKEEN JOHN); | [Y]DE1259230 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [Y]CH483683 (SECURITON AG [CH]); | [A]US3735396 (GETCHELL E) |