EP0094282 - An installation for the recovery of contaminated polyolefin plastics materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.1986 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guerrero Ferrer, Fernando Alzinaret 10 Andorra La Vella / AD | [1983/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peruga Cases, José Trav. de las Corts 271 Barcelona / ES | [1983/46] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/46] | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 83400819.5 | 26.04.1983 | [1983/46] | Priority number, date | ES19820512803 | 11.05.1982 Original published format: ES 512803 | [1983/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0094282 | Date: | 16.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0094282 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B29B17/00 | [1985/25] | CPC: |
B03B9/061 (EP);
B29B17/02 (EP);
B29B2017/0244 (EP);
B29B2017/0289 (EP);
B29K2023/06 (EP);
B29K2023/12 (EP);
B29K2105/065 (EP);
B29L2007/008 (EP);
Y02W30/52 (EP);
Y02W30/62 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1983/46] | B29C29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/46] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Rückgewinnung von verunreinigten Polyolefin-Kunststoffen | [1983/46] | English: | An installation for the recovery of contaminated polyolefin plastics materials | [1983/46] | French: | Dispositif pour la récupération de matériau synthétique polyoléfinique contaminé | [1983/46] | File destroyed: | 10.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 01.11.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/17] | 25.11.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1986/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1593390 (BICC LTD); | [A]US4106518 (BUZGA HEINRICH, et al); | [A]AT363051B (BIOMULL GES ZUR VERWERTUNG STA [AT]); | [A]DE2107268 ; | [A]US4199109 (WATANABE TADAO [JP]); | [A]FR2379319 (SOREMA SRL [IT]); | [A]GB1552118 (BEVIS M J, et al) |