EP0099762 - Coded remote control devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1987 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1987 [1987/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lewiner, Jacques 5, rue Bory d'Arnex F-92210 Saint-Cloud / FR | For all designated states Hennion, Claude 18, rue Flatters F-75005 Paris / FR | [1984/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/05] | Representative(s) | Behaghel, Pierre, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84 rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | [1984/05] | Application number, filing date | 83400992.0 | 17.05.1983 | [1984/05] | Priority number, date | FR19820009791 | 04.06.1982 Original published format: FR 8209791 | [1984/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0099762 | Date: | 01.02.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0099762 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1983 | Classification | IPC: | E05B49/00, E05F15/20 | [1984/05] | CPC: |
G07C9/00182 (EP,US);
E05F15/77 (EP,US);
G07C9/215 (EP,US);
G07C9/28 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/00 (EP,US);
G07C2009/00222 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT [1984/05] | Title | German: | Kodierbare Fernsteuerungsanordnungen | [1984/05] | English: | Coded remote control devices | [1984/05] | French: | Perfectionnements aux dispositifs de télécommande à code | [1984/05] | Examination procedure | 15.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/17] | 29.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4167833 (FARINA RICHARD C, et al); | [Y]US4083424 (VON DEN STEMMEN ALFONS, et al); | [Y]GB1531951 (EASTERN CO); | [A]FR2449771 (APAG ELEKTRONIK AG [CH]); | [A]US4148092 (MARTIN RICKY); | [A]US3733861 (LESTER R) |