EP0097549 - Device to realize the sealing of a submersible motor, and such a motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 11.08.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.1988 | Revocation of patent | published on 28.09.1988 [1988/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTEURS LEROY-SOMER Boulevard Marcellin Leroy 16000 Angoulême / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/01] | For all designated states MOTEURS LEROY-SOMER Société dite: Boulevard Marcellin Leroy F-16000 Angouleme / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnaudeau, Marcel 32, rue Boursault F-75017 Paris / FR | 02 /
Morin, Pierre 113, rue Danton F-92300 Levallois-Perret / FR | 03 /
Fouin, Jean 33, Résidence du Jardin Vert F-16000 Angouleme / FR | 04 /
Galais, Michel 2, allée Jules Védrines Cité Saint-Exupéry F-16000 Angouleme / FR | 05 /
Sardain, Christian 42, Impasse Gaston Grelat F-90100 Delle / FR | [1984/01] | Representative(s) | Bouju, André, et al Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A. B.P. 6250 75818 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Bouju, André, et al Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A. B.P. 6250 F-75818 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | ||
Former [1985/37] | Bouju, André 38 Avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1984/01] | Bouju, André 38 Avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 83401074.6 | 27.05.1983 | [1984/01] | Priority number, date | FR19820009746 | 04.06.1982 Original published format: FR 8209746 | [1984/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0097549 | Date: | 04.01.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0097549 | Date: | 27.08.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/132, H02K5/124, H02K9/19, F04D13/06, F16J15/40 | [1984/01] | CPC: |
F04D13/0653 (EP,US);
F16J15/406 (EP,US);
H02K5/124 (EP,US);
H02K5/132 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1984/01] | Title | German: | Anordnung um die Abdichtung eines Tauchmotors zu realisieren und sich darauf beziehender Motor | [1986/35] | English: | Device to realize the sealing of a submersible motor, and such a motor | [1984/01] | French: | Dispositif pour réaliser l'étanchéite d'un moteur immergeable et moteur s'y rapportant | [1984/01] |
Former [1984/01] | Anordnung um die Abdichtung eines Dompelmotors zu realisieren und sich darauf beziehender Motor | Examination procedure | 01.06.1983 | Examination requested [1984/01] | 06.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.05.1987
13.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE Klein, Schanzlin & Becker AG Johann-Klein-Strasse 9 D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | [1987/29] | 14.07.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.04.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.04.1988 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 07.05.1988 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1988/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2568548 (ELIOT HOWARD GILES PHILIP, et al); | [Y]US2002916 (EARL MENDENHALL, et al); | [A]FR2105902 (FRANKLIN ELECTRIC CO INC); | [A]FR2098196 (BORG WARNER); | [A]US2002915 (EARL MENDENHALL, et al); | [A]FR1432842 (FRANKLIN ELECTRIC CO INC) |