EP0098185 - Illumination device for an electro-optical medium for recording real time holograms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.1986 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.1986 [1986/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1984/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graindorge, Philippe THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Arditty, Hervé THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1984/02] | Application number, filing date | 83401156.1 | 07.06.1983 | [1984/02] | Priority number, date | FR19820010703 | 18.06.1982 Original published format: FR 8210703 | [1984/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0098185 | Date: | 11.01.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0098185 | Date: | 18.09.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G03H1/00, G02F1/03 | [1984/02] | CPC: |
G02F1/0338 (EP,US);
G03H1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/02] | Title | German: | Beleuchtungseinrichtung für ein elektro-optisches Medium zur Aufzeichnung von Echtzeithologrammen | [1985/38] | English: | Illumination device for an electro-optical medium for recording real time holograms | [1984/02] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairement d'un milieu électro-optique pour enregistrer des hologrammes en temps réel | [1984/02] |
Former [1984/02] | Beleuchtungseinrichtung von einem elektro-optischen Medium zur Aufzeichnung von Echtzeithologrammen | Examination procedure | 20.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/13] | 13.12.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.03.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2362466 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [A]US3767284 (DAMMANN H) | [A] - OPTICAL ENGINEERING; vol. 17, no. 5, septembre-octobre 1978, pages 470-479, S.P.I.E., Bellingham, USA | [A] - JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 48, no. 9, septembre 1977, pages 3683-3690, American Institute of Physics, New York, USA | Examination | - JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 48, no. 9, septembre 1977, pages 3683-3690, American Institute of Physics, New York, USA M. PELITER et al.: "Volume hologram recording and charge transfer process in Bi12Si020 and Bi12Ge020" |