EP0098208 - Device for measuring the water level in a closed space [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.1987 [1987/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique 31-33, rue de la Fédération, Boîte Postale 150 75752 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/02] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel 31/33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonnemay, Alain 20, Allée des Bouleaux F-91400 Orsay / FR | [1984/02] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1984/02] | Application number, filing date | 83401284.1 | 21.06.1983 | [1984/02] | Priority number, date | FR19820011078 | 24.06.1982 Original published format: FR 8211078 | [1984/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0098208 | Date: | 11.01.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0098208 | Date: | 10.09.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/28 | [1984/02] | CPC: |
G01F23/288 (EP,US);
G01F11/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/02] | Title | German: | Apparat zur Messung des Wasserniveaus in einem geschlossenen Raum | [1984/02] | English: | Device for measuring the water level in a closed space | [1984/02] | French: | Dispositif de mesure du niveau d'eau dans une enceinte | [1984/02] | Examination procedure | 13.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/34] | 26.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1179729 (VAKUTRONIK VEB); | [Y]US3594575 (SHOEMAKER DAVID J); | [AD]EP0025389 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [Y]US4268753 (MURAKAMI EUGENE T, et al) |