EP0099779 - Low-noise oscillator for the SHF range [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.1988 [1988/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1984/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bert, Alain THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Camiade, Marc THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1984/05] | Representative(s) | Taboureau, James, et al THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud 92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/05] | Taboureau, James, et al THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 83401288.2 | 21.06.1983 | [1984/05] | Priority number, date | FR19820011659 | 02.07.1982 Original published format: FR 8211659 | [1984/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0099779 | Date: | 01.02.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0099779 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H03B5/18 | [1984/05] | CPC: |
H03B5/1852 (EP,US);
H03B2200/0028 (EP,US);
H03B2200/0076 (EP,US);
H03B2200/0086 (EP,US);
H03B2200/0088 (EP,US);
H03B5/1876 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/05] | Title | German: | Rauscharmer Oszillator für den Höchstfrequenzbereich | [1984/05] | English: | Low-noise oscillator for the SHF range | [1984/05] | French: | Oscillateur à faible bruit, fonctionnant dans la gamme des hyperfréquences | [1984/05] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/37] | 31.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2376554 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [Y]EP0013174 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]US3444480 (TYKULSKY ALEXANDER, et al); | [A]US3662285 (RUCKER CHARLES T) | [A] - 1981 IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST, 1981, pages 313-315, IEEE, New York, USA | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, vol. MTT-29, no. 12, décembre 1981, pages 1333-1337, IEEE, New York, USA |