EP0102886 - Trimaran having at least vertically orientable halls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/11] | Trimaran | ||
[1987/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.1988 [1988/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forestier, Jean-Michel 26, rue d'Archilva F-64500 Saint Jean de Luz / FR | [1984/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/11] | Representative(s) | Hoisnard, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/11] | Hoisnard, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 83401609.9 | 03.08.1983 | [1984/11] | Priority number, date | FR19820013560 | 03.08.1982 Original published format: FR 8213560 | [1984/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0102886 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0102886 | Date: | 23.05.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0102886 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B63B1/14, B63B15/00 | [1984/11] | CPC: |
B63B15/0083 (EP);
B63B1/14 (EP);
B63B2001/145 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | GB [1986/32] |
Former [1984/11] | CH, GB, IT, LI | Title | German: | Trimaran mit um wenigstens vertikale Achsen verstellbaren Schwimmern | [1987/05] | English: | Trimaran having at least vertically orientable halls | [1987/05] | French: | Trimaran à flotteurs orientables au moins autour d'axes verticaux | [1987/05] |
Former [1984/11] | Trimaran | ||
Former [1984/11] | Trimaran | ||
Former [1984/11] | Trimaran | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/05] | 31.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4326475 [ ]; | GB1304511 [ ]; | FR2451312 [ ]; | FR2123587 [ ] |