EP0102302 - Bag for medical use, especially for parenteral feeding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1987 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYNTHELABO 22, avenue Galilée 92350 Le Plessis-Robinson / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/10] | For all designated states SYNTHELABO 22, avenue Galilée F-92350 Le Plessis-Robinson / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Porges, Etienne 9 Rue Dulud F-92200 Neuilly/Seine / FR | [1984/10] | Representative(s) | Bérogin, Francis Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, Rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/10] | Bérogin, Francis CABINET HARLE & PHELIP 21, rue de la Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 83401732.9 | 01.09.1983 | [1984/10] | Priority number, date | FR19820015008 | 02.09.1982 Original published format: FR 8215008 | [1984/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0102302 | Date: | 07.03.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0102302 | Date: | 04.04.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0102302 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/00 | [1984/10] | CPC: |
A61J1/10 (EP,US);
Y10S215/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/10] | Title | German: | Beutel für medizinischen Gebrauch, insbesondere bestimmt für parenterale Ernährung | [1984/10] | English: | Bag for medical use, especially for parenteral feeding | [1984/10] | French: | Poches à usage médical, et en particulier destinées à l'alimentation parentérale | [1984/10] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1984 | Examination requested [1984/47] | 18.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.10.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.09.1986 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | US1494950 [ ] (CLARK DAVID H); | US3342326 [ ] (ZACKHEIM ELI A); | US3520471 [ ] (FAUST CLIFFORD C); | US3740770 [ ] (VILLARI F); | US3788369 [ ] (KILLINGER F); | US4072233 [ ] (KRAMER KARL, et al); | FR2431289 [ ] (MONTEDISON SPA [IT]) |