EP0104999 - Gain switching device with reduced error for watt meter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.06.1990 [1990/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANGAMO WESTON, INC. 180 Technology Drive Norcross Georgia 30092 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/14] | For all designated states SANGAMO WESTON, INC. 180 Technology Drive Norcross Georgia 30092 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Randall, Bruce E. 15440 Hopewell Road Alpharetta Georgia 30201 / US | 02 /
Marshall, Jay K. 2415 Spring Lake Drive Marietta Georgia 30062 / US | [1984/14] | Representative(s) | Chareyron, Lucien, et al Service Brevets Patent Department Etudes et Productions Schlumberger BP 202 92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Chareyron, Lucien, et al Service Brevets Patent Department Etudes et Productions Schlumberger BP 202 F-92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1984/14] | Chareyron, Lucien Schlumberger Limited Service Brevets c/o Giers 12, place des Etats Unis B.P. 121 F-92124 Montrouge Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 83401855.8 | 23.09.1983 | [1984/14] | Priority number, date | US19820423399 | 24.09.1982 Original published format: US 423399 | [1984/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0104999 | Date: | 04.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0104999 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0104999 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01R21/00 | [1984/14] | CPC: |
G01R21/00 (EP,US);
G01R15/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1984/14] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Umschaltung der Verstärkung mit vermindertem Fehler für ein Wattmeter | [1984/14] | English: | Gain switching device with reduced error for watt meter | [1984/14] | French: | Dispositif pour changer de gain, avec erreur diminuée, pour un wattmètre | [1984/14] | Examination procedure | 21.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/06] | 11.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 13.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/26] | Request for further processing for: | 02.09.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.01.1989 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2929408 (STEPPER & CO); | [Y]DE2539344 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]DE3206114 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al); | [A]EP0008630 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [AD]US4058768 (MILKOVIC MIRAN) |