EP0107547 - Digital electronic time-division exchange with modular capacity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF TELEPHONE 146, Boulevard de Valmy 92707 Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/18] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF TELEPHONE 146, Boulevard de Valmy F-92707 Colombes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lecomte, Daniel THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Gibaud, Michel THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1984/18] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/14] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | ||
Former [1984/18] | Chaverneff, Vladimir THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 83401890.5 | 27.09.1983 | [1984/18] | Priority number, date | FR19820016682 | 05.10.1982 Original published format: FR 8216682 | [1984/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0107547 | Date: | 02.05.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [1984/18] | CPC: |
H04Q11/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [1984/18] | Title | German: | Digitale elektronische Zeitmultiplexvermittlungsanlage mit modularer Kapazität | [1984/18] | English: | Digital electronic time-division exchange with modular capacity | [1984/18] | French: | Autocommutateur électronique temporel numérique MIC à capacité modulable | [1984/18] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 04.10.1984 | Examination requested [1984/50] | 23.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.1985 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2459598 [ ]; | EP0006132 [ ] |