EP0110735 - Single gas plasma torch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1988 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.1988 [1988/45] | Applicant(s) | For:IT
SE
L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | For:BE
CH
DE
FR
GB
LI
NL
LA SOUDURE AUTOGENE FRANCAISE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | For:IT
SE
L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
For:BE
CH
DE
FR
GB
LI
NL
LA SOUDURE AUTOGENE FRANCAISE 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marhic, Gérard 16 D, Maradas Verts F-95000 Cergy / FR | 02 /
Schaff, Didier 3 bis, rue des Ponceaux F-95430 Auvers-sur-Oise / FR | 03 /
Remy, Francis 4, rue Guy de Maupassant F-95370 Montigny-les-Cormeilles / FR | [1984/24] | Representative(s) | Jacobson, Claude, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | Jacobson, Claude, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 83401896.2 | 28.09.1983 | [1984/24] | Priority number, date | FR19820016512 | 01.10.1982 Original published format: FR 8216512 | [1984/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0110735 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0110735 | Date: | 24.10.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0110735 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H05H1/28 | [1984/24] | CPC: |
H05H1/28 (EP,US);
H05H1/34 (EP,US);
H05H1/3436 (EP,US);
H05H1/3442 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/24] | Title | German: | Plasmabrenner, der mit einem einzigen Gas arbeitet | [1984/24] | English: | Single gas plasma torch | [1984/24] | French: | Torche à plasma monogaz | [1984/24] | Examination procedure | 01.10.1983 | Examination requested [1984/24] | 23.12.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3217133 (RENE MATTMULLER); | [A]US3562486 (HATCH BRUCE O, et al); | [AD]FR2275270 (INST ELEKTROSVAROCHNOGO OBORUD [SU]) |