EP0107553 - Device for automatically processing data on a card, particularly a magnetic and/or electronic card [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE EUROPEENNE DE COMPOSANTS ELECTRONIQUES LCC 50, rue Jean -Pierre Timbaud B.P. 301 F-92402 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/25] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE EUROPEENNE DE COMPOSANTS ELECTRONIQUES LCC 50, rue Jean -Pierre Timbaud B.P. 301 F-92402 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1984/18] | For all designated states L.C.C.-C.I.C.E. - COMPAGNIE EUROPEENNE DE COMPOSANTS ELECTRONIQUES 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud B.P. 301 F-92402 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chabrolle, Jacques THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1984/18] | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1985/03] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS 9 Place des Vosges La Défense 10 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1984/30] | Eisenbeth, Jacques Pierre THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | ||
Former [1984/18] | Jacquard, Philippe THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 83401943.2 | 04.10.1983 | [1984/18] | Priority number, date | FR19820017295 | 15.10.1982 Original published format: FR 8217295 | [1984/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0107553 | Date: | 02.05.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0107553 | Date: | 11.02.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/08 | [1984/18] | CPC: |
G06K7/084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1987/07] |
Former [1984/18] | BE, DE, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur automatischen Verarbeitung von Daten einer Karte, insbesondere von einer magnetischen und/oder elektronischen Karte | [1984/18] | English: | Device for automatically processing data on a card, particularly a magnetic and/or electronic card | [1984/18] | French: | Dispositif de traitement automatique des informations d'une carte, notamment d'une carte magnétique et/ou électronique | [1984/18] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/34] | 30.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4151564 [ ]; | US3555246 [ ]; | FR2356206 [ ] |