EP0110780 - Method of making thin slabs moulded with a network reinforcement, and plant for carrying it out [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 16.06.1988 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guerin, Gabriel Route de Louerré F-49350 Gennes / FR | [1984/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/24] | Representative(s) | Lemonnier, André Cabinet LEMONNIER 4, Boulevard Saint-Denis F-75010 Paris / FR | [1984/24] | Application number, filing date | 83402266.7 | 24.11.1983 | [1984/24] | Priority number, date | FR19820019891 | 26.11.1982 Original published format: FR 8219891 | [1984/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0110780 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0110780 | Date: | 02.04.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B28B23/00 | [1984/24] | CPC: |
B28B23/022 (EP);
B28B23/0006 (EP);
B28B23/0062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von dünnen geformten Platten mit Netzwerkbewehrung und Vorrichtung zu dessen Durchführung | [1984/24] | English: | Method of making thin slabs moulded with a network reinforcement, and plant for carrying it out | [1984/24] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de plaques minces moulées avec armature en réseau et installation pour sa mise en oeuvre | [1984/24] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 02.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/42] | 25.06.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.12.1986
21.02.1987
ADMISSIBLE Rigips GmbH Rühler Strasse D-37619 Bodenwerder / DE Opponent's representative Rücker, Wolfgang Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.12.1986
21.02.1987
ADMISSIBLE Rigips GmbH Rühler Strasse D-37619 Bodenwerder / DE Opponent's representative Rücker, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | 24.02.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.06.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.06.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 02.10.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 24.02.1988 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 05.03.1988 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1988/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.04.1986 | IT | 02.04.1986 | NL | 02.04.1986 | SE | 30.04.1986 | CH | 30.11.1986 | LI | 30.11.1986 | LU | 30.11.1986 | [1999/52] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 02.04.1986 | |
IT | 02.04.1986 | ||
NL | 02.04.1986 | ||
SE | 30.04.1986 | ||
CH | 30.11.1986 | ||
LI | 30.11.1986 | ||
Former [1989/23] | AT | 02.04.1986 | |
NL | 02.04.1986 | ||
SE | 30.04.1986 | ||
CH | 30.11.1986 | ||
LI | 30.11.1986 | ||
Former [1989/15] | AT | 02.04.1986 | |
NL | 02.04.1986 | ||
SE | 30.04.1986 | ||
Former [1988/26] | AT | 02.04.1986 | |
NL | 02.04.1986 | ||
Former [1987/20] | AT | 02.04.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | FR1024009 [ ]; | DE1253128 [ ] (BAU INGENIEUR BUERO DIPL ING W, et al); | FR2352665 [ ] (GILLESPIE DAVID [GB]); | DE2854228 [ ] (YTONG AG); | EP0051101 [ ] (ODLER IVAN PROF DR ING [DE], et al) |