EP0111431 - Suspension device for an overhead contact wire feeding electric-traction vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.05.1987 [1987/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. Delachaux 119, Avenue Louis-Roche F-92231 Gennevilliers / FR | [1984/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruellan, André 4 rue de la Libération F-95880 Enghien les Bains / FR | [1984/25] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/25] | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 83402279.0 | 25.11.1983 | [1984/25] | Priority number, date | FR19820020560 | 08.12.1982 Original published format: FR 8220560 | [1984/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0111431 | Date: | 20.06.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0111431 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B60M1/24 | [1984/25] | CPC: |
B60M1/24 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32418 (EP,US);
Y10T403/5781 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, IT, LI [1984/25] | Title | German: | Aufhängevorrichtung für Oberleitungsdraht zur Speisung von Fahrzeugen mit elektrischer Traktion | [1984/25] | English: | Suspension device for an overhead contact wire feeding electric-traction vehicles | [1984/25] | French: | Dispositif de suspension de fil de contact aérien alimentant des véhicules à traction électrique | [1984/25] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/38] | 20.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US1402000 [ ] (MATTHES SAMUEL S); | FR680896 [ ] (GENNEVILLIERS ACIERIES); | DE534484 [ ] (FURRER & FREY); | FR997755 [ ]; | FR1016249 [ ] (TECH ET COMMERCE); | CH454209 [ ] (KUMMLER & MATTER AG [CH]) |