EP0112238 - Process and apparatus for particle implantation in solids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique 31-33, rue de la Fédération, Boîte Postale 150 75752 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/26] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel 31/33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bruel, Michel Lotissement Presvert No 9 F-38113 Veurey Voroize / FR | 02 /
Soubie, Alain 3, rue Casimir Brenier F-38120 Saint Egreve / FR | 03 /
Spinelli, Philippe 24, rue Boileau F-38700 La Tronche / FR | [1984/26] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1984/26] | Application number, filing date | 83402341.8 | 05.12.1983 | [1984/26] | Priority number, date | FR19820020720 | 10.12.1982 Original published format: FR 8220720 | [1984/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0112238 | Date: | 27.06.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0112238 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/317, H01L21/265, H01J27/20 | [1984/26] | CPC: |
H01J37/3171 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1984/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Partikel-Implantation in einem Festkörper | [1984/26] | English: | Process and apparatus for particle implantation in solids | [1984/26] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'implantation de particules dans un solide | [1984/26] | File destroyed: | 10.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 10.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 04.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1558881 ; | [A]US4108751 (KING WILLIAM J) | [A] - NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS AND METHODS, volume 182/183, partie 1, avril-mai 1981 (AMSTERDAM, NL) T. WADA "A new recoil implantation in Si using electron bombardment"pages 131-136 |