EP0106773 - Device for developing and printing photographs simultaneously [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 03.05.1989 [1989/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIS PHOTO INDUSTRIE 17 Boulevard Henri IV F-75004 Paris / FR | [1984/43] |
Former [1984/17] | For all designated states Kis France Société Anonyme Société dite: 47 Avenue Marie Reynoard F-38100 Grenoble / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thebault, Claude 19, avenue du Vercors F-38240 Meylan / FR | [1984/17] | Representative(s) | Laurent, Michel, et al Cabinet LAURENT et CHARRAS, 20, rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32 F-69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | [1984/17] | Application number, filing date | 83420157.6 | 29.09.1983 | [1984/17] | Priority number, date | FR19820016841 | 05.10.1982 Original published format: FR 8216841 | FR19830004698 | 18.03.1983 Original published format: FR 8304698 | [1984/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0106773 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0106773 | Date: | 03.06.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/23] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0106773 | Date: | 15.01.1988 | [1988/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G03B27/32, G03B27/58 | [1984/17] | CPC: |
G03B27/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/17] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur gleichzeitigen Vergrösserung, und Entwicklung von Photos | [1984/17] | English: | Device for developing and printing photographs simultaneously | [1984/17] | French: | Dispositif perfectionné pour le tirage et le développement simultanés de photographies | [1984/17] | Examination procedure | 18.10.1984 | Examination requested [1985/02] | 24.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 03.06.1987 | SE | 30.06.1987 | [1989/18] |
Former [1989/02] | NL | 03.06.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | US3308717 [ ] (YOSHIRO OKISHIMA, et al); | DE2050012 [ ] (KALLE AG); | US3685150 [ ] (RISHER FREDERICK L); | US3737227 [ ] (HARTER J, et al); | GB2070792 [ ] (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG) |