EP0102910 - Conveyor cover for acoustic and sterile isolation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.1992 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SERRURERIE-CHAUDRONNERIE TUYAUTERIE INDUSTRIELLE Guy RIONDE "La Samaritaine" F-88800 Vittel / FR | [1984/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rionde, Guy 98 rue Saint Eloy F-88800 Vittel / FR | [1984/11] | Representative(s) | Metz, Paul Cabinet Metz Patni 1a Place Boecler B.P. 10063 67024 Strasbourg Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Metz, Paul Cabinet Metz Patni 1a Place Boecler B.P. 10063 67024 Strasbourg Cedex 1 / FR | ||
Former [1984/47] | Metz, Paul CABINET METZ PATNI 63, rue de la Ganzau B.P. 63 F-67024 Strasbourg Cédex 1 / FR | ||
Former [1984/11] | Bossard, Jacques-René MEYER & COURTASSOL Bureau Europe 20, Place des Halles F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 83440030.1 | 25.05.1983 | [1984/11] | Priority number, date | FR19820013740 | 04.08.1982 Original published format: FR 8213740 | [1984/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0102910 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0102910 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/16, B65G21/08 | [1984/11] | CPC: |
G10K11/16 (EP);
B65G21/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/11] | Title | German: | Schalldicht und Luftdicht abgeschlossene Haube für eine Förderbandanlage | [1984/11] | English: | Conveyor cover for acoustic and sterile isolation | [1984/11] | French: | Ensemble de capotage pour isolation phonique et stérile d'unités à bande transporteuse | [1984/11] | Examination procedure | 05.09.1984 | Examination requested [1984/47] | 17.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 26.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 21.11.1989 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.11.1989 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 28.05.1988 | Appeal received No. T0548/88 | 29.09.1988 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.02.1989 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M03) [1989/07] | 21.11.1989 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1988 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   10.10.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 02.05.1991 | [1991/51] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3905444 (EVANS JR WILLIAM O); | [A]US4093066 (MITCHELL CHARLES RONALD, et al); | [A]FR2388878 (ELF AQUITAINE [FR]); | [A]FR2454986 (MASSICOT ROBERT) |